Can You Pass This 2-Digit Multiplication Quiz Without Using a Calculator?

EDUCATION

Isadora Teich

5 Min Quiz

12x18=?

12x18=216. Be honest - were you tempted to use a calculator for this one? Break it down into two parts - 10 times 18 and 2 times 18.

Advertisement

10x15=?

10x15=150. When multiplying a number by 10, you can just add a zero to it to find the right answer.

Advertisement

17x25=?

17x25=425. Whenever you multiply a number that ends in a 5, the result will end in either a 5 or a 0.

Advertisement

11x30=?

11x30=330. When you multiply a two-digit number ending in zero by 11, repeat the first digit and then add a zero on the end to find the answer.

Advertisement

21x52=?

21x52=1092. Did you use a calculator or break it down and do it in your head? It's just 20 times 52, plus one extra 52.

Advertisement

34x12=?

34x12=408. When two even numbers are multiplied, the answer is also even.

Advertisement

98x10=?

98x10=980. Here the rule of ten applies.

Advertisement

61x29=?

61x29=1,769. You could try multiplying 60x29, then adding one extra 29!

Advertisement

50x31=?

50x31=1,550. If it makes it easier, you can break problems like this down. Multiplying 31 by 5 and then multiplying that answer by 10 will get you to the same place.

Advertisement

42x70=?

42x70=2,940. Multiply 42 by 7, then add a zero at the end!

Advertisement

11x95=?

11x95=1,045. Think about it - you could just add 950 and 95.

Advertisement

52x71=?

52x71=3,692. Multiply 52 by 70, then add an extra 52.

Advertisement

85x29=?

85x29=2,465. Sometimes, when dealing with multiples of five, breaking things down can help. 5x17=85. So, multiplying 29 by 5, and then that answer by 17 will get you to the same place.

Advertisement

69x93=?

69x93=6,417. Did you break this down? Multiply 70 by 93, then subtract 93.

Advertisement

87x19=?

87x19=1,653. Try multiplying 87 by 20, then subtracting the extra 87!

Advertisement

52x76=?

52x76=3,952. How did you break this one down? Perhaps 50 times 76, added to 2 times 76?

Advertisement

80x29=?

80x29=2,320. When broken down, this one gets a little bit easier. 8x10=80, so you can also do 29x10, and then multiply that answer by 8 to get to the final answer.

Advertisement

90x45=?

90x45=4,050. Try 9 times 45, then multiplying that by 10. Simple, right?

Advertisement

55x99=?

55x99=5,445. 99 is almost 100, so multiply 55 by 100 and subtract 55.

Advertisement

13x77=?

13x77=1,001. Remember, when you multiply a pair of odd numbers, the answer will always be odd. How did you break this one down into manageable parts?

Advertisement

51x45=?

51x45=2,295. Multiply 45 by 50, then add an extra 45, right?

Advertisement

23x76=?

23x76=1,748. When an odd number and even number are multiplied. the answer is always an even number.

Advertisement

52x11=?

52x11=572. That's 520 plus 52. Does that make sense? Use the 11 to your best advantage.

Advertisement

85x82=?

85x82=6,970. 8x8 is 64, which can give you a rough instant idea of around what the final answer will start with. Remember your simple multiples!

Advertisement

90x50=?

90x50=4,500. When multiplying by two-digit numbers that end in 0, each adds a 0 to the final answer.

Advertisement

98x71=?

98x71=6,958. Don't panic - it's just 98 times 70, then an extra 98. That's 6,860 plus 98, which is 6,958.

Advertisement

84x79=?

84x79=6,636. Think about multiplying 84 by 80, then take things from there.

Advertisement

12x66=?

12x66=792. You can break this down into the multiples of 12 to make it a little easier. For example: 66x4x3=792.

Advertisement

88x88=?

88x88=7,744. Multiply 88 by 8, then multiply 88 by 80, then add the results. So many 8s!

Advertisement

51x52=?

51x52=2,652. You know 50 times 50 is 2,500, so your answer has to be a little bit more than that.

Advertisement

78x23=?

78x23=1,794. Remember, multiplying an odd and an even number always results in an even number.

Advertisement

62x58=?

62x58=3,596. Will you round down the 62 to make this one easier, or round up the 58?

Advertisement

66x37=?

66x37=2,442. Multiply 6 by 37, then 60 by 37. Now just add those together.

Advertisement

15x90=?

15x90=1,350. When multiplying multiples of 5, your answer can only end in 0 or 5.

Advertisement

99x99=?

99x99=9,801. You can break multiples of 9 down into 3s if it helps! Alternatively, multiply 100 by 99, then subtract 99.

Advertisement

Explore More Quizzes

Image: Digital Vision / DigitalVision / Getty Images

About This Quiz

Are you a mental math whiz who doesn't need a calculator to put numbers in their place? Many people struggle with math throughout their lives, a struggle that starts in their early years of schooling. However, everyone's brain is different. While some people can read a book in a night or pick up foreign languages with ease, other people are mathematical machines. Some people rarely have to use calculators to do math in their day-to-day lives, because they are the calculator. We all have different skills and strengths, but when it comes to math, it's not many people's idea of fun. 

However, for some people, numbers just make sense. They click. If you are a number-crunching genius with a truly mathematical mind, see if you can take on this 2-digit multiplication quiz without so much as taking a peek at your handy calculator. Are you ready to stretch the muscles of the mind and put your brain to the test with a fun math quiz? 

Challenge your mind and see if your mental math skills are truly up to snuff with this calculator-free multiplication quiz! This math test is a no-calculator zone! No tech! No cheating! Get ready to multiply! 

About HowStuffWorks Play

How much do you know about dinosaurs? What is an octane rating? And how do you use a proper noun? Lucky for you, HowStuffWorks Play is here to help. Our award-winning website offers reliable, easy-to-understand explanations about how the world works. From fun quizzes that bring joy to your day, to compelling photography and fascinating lists, HowStuffWorks Play offers something for everyone. Sometimes we explain how stuff works, other times, we ask you, but we’re always exploring in the name of fun! Because learning is fun, so stick with us!